Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Karl-Heinz Mrosko (until 1989-06-30) | 1946-10-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Asche (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-02-01 | ||||
Stefan Burger (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-12-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jan Schindelmeiser (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-12-17 | ||||
Matthias Holzenkamp (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-07-31 | ||||
Carsten Meyer (from 1988-07-07) (until 1989-06-30) | |||||
Volker Schmidt (until 1989-06-30) | |||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Olaf Niemeyer (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-04-22 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Pilz (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-06-19 | ||||
Andreas Wolff (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-08-21 | ||||
Dorde Curcic (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-12-15 | ||||
Lutz Lillig (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-07-03 | ||||
Andreas Reinke (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-01-03 | ||||
Stefan Porde (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-10-29 | ||||
Ulrich Wilke (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-05-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Rudiger Schulz (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-04-19 | ||||
Stephan Koppe (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-01-12 | ||||
Torsten Koppe (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-09-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1989-05-17 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-05-21 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-05-28 00:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1989-05-31 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-06-04 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1989-06-07 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1989-06-14 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-06-18 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |