Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Franz Brungs (until 1989-09-13) | 1936-12-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thomas Kneuer (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-03-26 | |||
1 | Hans Wulf (until 1990-06-30) | 1951-10-31 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Sascha Strunk (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-11-18 | ||||
2 | Jorg Muller (until 1991-06-30) | 1958-07-21 | |||
3 | Bodo Schmidt (until 1995-06-30) | 1965-07-09 | |||
5 | Gunter Eymold (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-04-17 | |||
5 | Holger Bruck (until 1990-06-30) | 1947-09-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Drube (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-10-22 | ||||
Lars Findler (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-02-20 | ||||
Dieter Hecking (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Peter Mohr (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-01-03 | ||||
Wolfgang Zientek (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-08-07 | ||||
2 | Thomas Schmidt (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-09-28 | |||
3 | Kai-Uwe Schnell (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-12-14 | |||
11 | Frank Hohle (until 1997-12-31) | 1966-12-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ralph Kistner (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-04-26 | ||||
Jozsef Burjan (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-08-30 | ||||
Gerhard Honig (until 1989-06-30) | |||||
7 | Lothar Sippel (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-05-09 | |||
9 | Dirk Schmelting (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-11-14 | |||
10 | Terry Scott (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-12-17 | |||
11 | Hans-Georg Marhenke (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-04-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1989-05-20 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1989-05-25 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-05-28 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1989-06-03 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-06-11 00:00 |
6 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-06-18 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |