Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Helmut Horsch (until 1989-06-30) | 1948-10-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dirk Winter (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-12-18 | ||||
Ralf Mester (until 1989-06-30) | |||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Knauer (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-02-02 | ||||
Jorg Silberbach (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-03-08 | ||||
Bennie Brinkman (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-11-01 | ||||
Frank Vollmer (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-07-28 | ||||
Christoph Stech (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-08-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Reinhard Geise (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-10-17 | ||||
Ulli Gaher (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-01-06 | ||||
Dirk Bremser (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-10-01 | ||||
Alfons Beckstedde (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-03-13 | ||||
Jurgen Koop (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-01-28 | ||||
Maik Thiemann (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-09-23 | ||||
David Bennett (until 1989-06-30) | 1961 | ||||
Justus Stech (until 1989-06-30) | |||||
Holger Drewes (until 1989-06-30) | |||||
Helmut Gorka (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-04-13 | ||||
Christos Orkas (from 1989-01-01) (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-08-25 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Guido Fleige (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-05-07 | ||||
Ludger Pickenacker (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-02-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1989-05-21 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1989-05-24 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-05-28 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1989-05-31 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1989-06-07 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-06-11 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1989-06-14 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-06-18 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |