Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (until 1989-06-30) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Geiger (until 1990-06-30) | 1957-10-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Manfred Vohringer (until 1992-06-30) | 1989-10-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Schwend (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-06-11 | ||||
Jurgen Schnizler (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-11-30 | ||||
Jurgen Schaich (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-12-01 | ||||
Helmar Grieswald (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-11-23 | ||||
Thomas Bauer (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-03-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Markus Pleuler (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-05-10 | ||||
Otmar Rosch (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-08-26 | ||||
Oliver Muller (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-04-11 | ||||
Hermann Rudolf (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-10-07 | ||||
Jorg Spannenberger (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-12-13 | ||||
Pascal Muller (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-06-05 | ||||
Necmettin Inan (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-09-07 | ||||
Wolfram Bauer (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-10-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Klaus Weiss (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-06-03 | ||||
Thomas Jager (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-10-17 | ||||
Manfred Schittek (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-06-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1989-05-20 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1989-05-25 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-05-28 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1989-06-03 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-06-11 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1989-06-18 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |