Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Strack (until 1990-06-30) | 1954-03-22 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Geiger (until 1990-06-30) | 1957-10-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Henning Hansen (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-09-07 | ||||
Manfred Vohringer (until 1992-06-30) | 1989-10-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Schwend (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-06-11 | ||||
Jurgen Schnizler (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-11-30 | ||||
Jurgen Schaich (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-12-01 | ||||
Helmar Grieswald (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-11-23 | ||||
Thomas Bauer (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-03-07 | ||||
Volker Ruoff (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-12-26 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Markus Pleuler (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-05-10 | ||||
Otmar Rosch (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-08-26 | ||||
Oliver Muller (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-04-11 | ||||
Hermann Rudolf (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-10-07 | ||||
Jorg Spannenberger (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-12-13 | ||||
Pascal Muller (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-06-05 | ||||
Necmettin Inan (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-09-07 | ||||
Wolfram Bauer (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-10-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bjorn Roth (until 1992-06-30) | 1971-01-14 | ||||
Klaus Weiss (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-06-03 | ||||
Thomas Jager (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-10-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1990-05-20 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1990-05-27 15:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1990-06-02 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1990-06-06 19:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1990-06-10 15:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1990-06-17 15:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |