Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Brand (until 1991-06-30) | 1946-01-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Roland Kuppig (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-05-01 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank Lebong (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-02-26 | ||||
Heiko Walle (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-10-26 | ||||
Joachim Brehmer (until 1993-06-30) | 1961-04-23 | ||||
Frank Walle (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-10-26 | ||||
Werner Jakobs (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-01-06 | ||||
Stefan Bruckmann (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-02-13 | ||||
Sven Christians (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-01-28 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Frank Giesselmann (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-12-11 | ||||
Frank Sus (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-12-04 | ||||
Uwe Grub (until 1993-06-30) | 1961-01-25 | ||||
Martin Fiannaca (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-02-28 | ||||
Jay Jay Okocha (until 1992-06-30) | 1973-08-14 | ||||
Gerald Klein (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-09-06 | ||||
Frank Muller (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-08-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Guido Cullmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-10-23 | ||||
Thomas Schafer (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-02-24 | ||||
Christoph Mees (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-06-01 | ||||
Klaus Muller (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-06-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1991-05-19 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1991-05-26 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1991-06-02 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1991-06-08 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1991-06-12 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1991-06-16 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |