Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Detlef Pirsig (until 1993-03-25) | 1945-10-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andre Stocki (until 1998-06-30) | 1962-03-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Viktor Bridaitis (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-05-18 | ||||
Sigitas Jakubauskas (until 1999-06-30) | 1958-12-29 | ||||
Zdenko Kosanovic (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-05-13 | ||||
Frank Kayser (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-09-24 | ||||
Uwe Freitag (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-02-15 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Peter Gemein (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-09-14 | ||||
Martin Tilner (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-02-01 | ||||
Michael Griehsbach (until 1993-06-30) | 1961-09-28 | ||||
Carsten Propper (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-10-20 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Schmidt (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-03-19 | ||||
Ralf Kessen (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-09-07 | ||||
Achim Grun (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-01-03 | ||||
Thomas Grabienski (until 1991-06-30) | |||||
Sturm | |||||
Andre Kroning (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-10-23 | ||||
Stanislav Tamulevicius (until 1991-06-30) |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1991-05-15 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1991-05-19 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1991-05-22 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1991-05-29 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1991-06-02 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1991-06-06 00:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1991-06-09 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1991-06-15 00:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |