Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ernst Menzel (until 1991-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Hossbach (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-11-13 | ||||
Uwe Bullmann (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-12-22 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Geiger (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-09-27 | ||||
Uwe Otto (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-09-29 | ||||
Gianni Lazzara (until 1991-06-30) | 1972-04-22 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Silviu Vuia (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-05-31 | ||||
Heiner Pahl (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-02-27 | ||||
Olaf Ansorge (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-06-04 | ||||
Carlos Tavares (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-09-06 | ||||
Michael Endrikat (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-04-20 | ||||
Oliver Schwarz (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-12-16 | ||||
Gultekin Gultas (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-08-20 | ||||
Ralf Wilhelm (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-10-17 | ||||
Ralf Elsner (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-05-28 | ||||
Mathias Fiebich (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-11-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Holger Fiebich (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-05-21 | ||||
Frank Plagge (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Patrick Evers (until 1992-06-30) | 1973-01-08 | ||||
Rainer Kirschning (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-09-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1991-05-15 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1991-05-22 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1991-05-26 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1991-05-29 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1991-06-02 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1991-06-09 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1991-06-12 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1991-06-15 00:00 |
5 : 3 |
Schema Compare |