Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans-Werner Moors (until 1994-05-09) | 1950-07-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Zdenko Miletic (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-04-23 | ||||
Ulf Johannemann (until 1992-06-30) | 1971-02-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Knauer (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-02-02 | ||||
Paul Jaschke (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-04-18 | ||||
Andre Bertelsbeck (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-12-03 | ||||
Jorg Silberbach (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-03-08 | ||||
Bennie Brinkman (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-11-01 | ||||
4 | Olaf Buschkotter (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-01-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jochen Falk (until 1994-06-30) | |||||
Ansgar Brinkmann (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-07-05 | ||||
Reinhard Geise (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-10-17 | ||||
Christos Orkas (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-08-25 | ||||
Peer Posipal (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-07-03 | ||||
Jochen Terhaar (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-12-06 | ||||
Matthias Vogt (until 1992-06-30) | |||||
Sturm | |||||
Erik Groeleken (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-03-03 | ||||
Heiko Ueding (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-10-04 | ||||
Guido Fleige (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-05-07 | ||||
Henry Acquah (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-08-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1992-05-24 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1992-05-28 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1992-06-02 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1992-06-07 15:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |