Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wilfried Grobner (until 1994-06-30) | 1949-12-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Henning Hansen (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-09-07 | ||||
Manfred Vohringer (until 1992-06-30) | 1989-10-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Schwend (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-06-11 | ||||
Uwe Scholer (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-12-08 | ||||
Jurgen Schnizler (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-11-30 | ||||
Jurgen Schaich (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-12-01 | ||||
Andreas Hintke (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-07-31 | ||||
Marc Heinkelein (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-12-30 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Artur Beck (until 1998-12-31) | 1966-02-24 | ||||
Thomas Winter (until 1997-12-31) | 1967-09-22 | ||||
Ivica Silic (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-01-07 | ||||
Markus Pleuler (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-05-10 | ||||
Oliver Merkel (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-02-13 | ||||
Uwe Heth (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-10-27 | ||||
Markus Gisdol (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-08-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Holger Demme (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-11-25 | ||||
Klaus Schmidt (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-12-06 | ||||
Bjorn Roth (until 1992-06-30) | 1971-01-14 | ||||
Klaus Weiss (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-06-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1992-05-24 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1992-05-28 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1992-06-03 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 1992-06-08 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |