Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Erkenbrecher (until 1993-02-08) | 1954-11-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Hossbach (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-11-13 | ||||
Burkhard Kick (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-08-25 | ||||
Uwe Bullmann (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-12-22 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Geiger (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-09-27 | ||||
Uwe Otto (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-09-29 | ||||
15 | Peter Kleeschatzky (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-06-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jacek Frackiewicz (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-09-19 | ||||
Bruno Akrapovic (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-09-26 | ||||
Thorsten Kohn (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-06-26 | ||||
Uwe Koschinat (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-09-01 | ||||
Silviu Vuia (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-05-31 | ||||
Heiner Pahl (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-02-27 | ||||
Olaf Ansorge (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-06-04 | ||||
Carlos Tavares (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-09-06 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Siegfried Reich (until 1996-06-30) | 1959-09-29 | ||||
Holger Fiebich (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-05-21 | ||||
Frank Plagge (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Patrick Evers (until 1992-06-30) | 1973-01-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1992-05-22 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1992-05-28 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1992-05-31 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1992-06-03 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1992-06-07 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1992-06-13 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |