Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Jerat (until 1992-06-30) | 1955-02-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Albracht (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-11-30 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dirk Pusch (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-01-30 | ||||
Rudi Muller (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-09-28 | ||||
Kurt Balewski (until 1993-06-30) | 1958-06-05 | ||||
Matyas Juracsik (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-10-01 | ||||
Mirko Vogt (until 1993-06-30) | 1972-03-29 | ||||
Dietmar Klinger (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-01-08 | ||||
Sven Christians (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-01-28 | ||||
Rytis Narusevicius (from 1992-01-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-03-09 | ||||
Bjorn Arens (until 1992-06-30) | 1972-09-29 | ||||
Marc Schweiger (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-03-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christian Broos (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-03-30 | ||||
Frank Zilles (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-01-29 | ||||
Mieczyslaw Szewczyk (from 1992-01-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-09-11 | ||||
Lars Kindgen (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-11-25 | ||||
Thomas Propper (until 1993-09-30) | 1970-08-04 | ||||
Hans-Werner Reif (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-12-03 | ||||
Siegmar Bieber (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-01-04 | ||||
Gintaras Rimkus (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-11-30 | ||||
Michael Kentschke (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-06-10 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Kremer (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-09-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1992-05-28 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1992-05-31 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1992-06-07 15:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1992-06-13 15:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |