Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans-Werner Moors (until 1994-05-09) | 1950-07-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Zdenko Miletic (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-04-23 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Knauer (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-02-02 | ||||
Paul Jaschke (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-04-18 | ||||
Andre Bertelsbeck (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-12-03 | ||||
Thomas Siewert (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-11-04 | ||||
Jorg Silberbach (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-03-08 | ||||
4 | Olaf Buschkotter (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-01-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Serr (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-05-21 | ||||
Roland Twyrdy (until 1994-11-30) | 1969-08-21 | ||||
Ralf Lewe (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-05-13 | ||||
Jochen Falk (until 1994-06-30) | |||||
Ansgar Brinkmann (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-07-05 | ||||
Reinhard Geise (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-10-17 | ||||
Christos Orkas (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-08-25 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Thorsten Kornmaier (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-06-26 | ||||
Erik Groeleken (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-03-03 | ||||
Dirk Schmelting (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-11-14 | ||||
Heiko Ueding (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-10-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1993-05-20 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1993-05-23 15:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1993-05-29 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1993-06-02 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1993-06-06 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1993-06-13 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |