Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Werner Voigt (until 1994-08-26) | 1947-06-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jens Adler (from 1994-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1965-04-25 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Sylvio Demuth (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-05-22 | ||||
Marcus Petsch (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-06-08 | ||||
Jorg Buder (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-09-24 | ||||
Rico Pellmann (until 1994-12-31) | 1970-10-08 | ||||
Rene Schneider (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-02-01 | ||||
Dietmar Bletsch (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-06-18 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andreas Lindner (until 2001-06-30) | 1962-07-15 | ||||
Andreas Joppien (until 1994-12-31) | 1968-09-15 | ||||
Michael Hartmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1974-07-11 | ||||
Jan Voss (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-09-26 | ||||
Dietmar Drabow (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-01-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Midhat Gluhacevic (until 1995-06-30) | 1965-06-02 | ||||
Thomas Reif (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-08-13 | ||||
Andreas Kossowski (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-11-23 | ||||
Oleh Holowan (until 1994-12-31) | 1971-09-21 | ||||
Michael Steffen (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-07-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1994-05-22 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1994-05-29 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1994-06-02 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1994-06-11 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |