Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ulrich Nikolinski (until 1994-06-30) | 1945-08-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hagen Reeck (until 2004-06-30) | 1959-09-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Holger Hunsche (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-12-14 | ||||
Uwe Kleemann (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Maik Pohland (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-03-12 | ||||
Uwe Woyde (from 1994-01-01) (until 1994-12-31) | 1966-02-05 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ingolf Schneider (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-11-28 | ||||
Dirk Rettig (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-11-13 | ||||
Holger Fandrich (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-09-06 | ||||
Heiko Petrick (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-10-15 | ||||
Thomas Walter (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-07-27 | ||||
6 | Detlef Irrgang (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-05-27 | |||
14 | Jorg Woltmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-11-30 | |||
20 | Holger Fraedrich (until 1998-12-31) | 1968-08-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Olaf Besser (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-04-22 | ||||
Toralf Konetzke (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-12-10 | ||||
Volkmar Kuhlee (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-02-24 | ||||
Petrik Sander (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-11-17 | ||||
28 | Sven Kubis (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-05-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1994-05-22 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1994-05-25 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1994-06-02 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1994-06-05 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |