Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rainer Zobel (until 1996-10-13) | 1948-11-03 | ||||
Jurgen Sundermann (until 1996-06-30) | 1940-01-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Nico Thomaschewski (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-02-10 | ||||
Marco Sejna (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-03-20 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jorn Lenz (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-04-12 | ||||
Taskin Aksoy (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-06-13 | ||||
Uli Bayerschmidt (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-03-03 | ||||
Olaf Backasch (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-10-04 | ||||
Jorg Weber (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-11-21 | ||||
6 | Olaf Kapagiannidis (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-06-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tim Gutberlet (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-08-23 | ||||
Mike Klenge (until 1996-12-31) | 1968-08-18 | ||||
Almedin Civa (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-04-27 | ||||
Martino Gatti (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-10-23 | ||||
Stanislav Levy (until 1996-06-30) | 1958-05-02 | ||||
Jens Henschel (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-09-18 | ||||
Niels Mackel (from 1996-01-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-06-03 | ||||
Kachaber Katscharawa (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-06-19 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Thomas Adler (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-01-23 | ||||
Michail Rusajew (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-11-15 | ||||
7 | Harun Isa (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-06-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1996-06-02 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1996-06-09 00:00 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |