Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hubert Huring (until 1997-06-30) | 1950-05-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Hans Jorg Butt (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-05-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wieslaw Cisek (until 2001-06-30) | 1963-01-02 | ||||
Maciej Janiak (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-08-16 | ||||
Frank Claassen (until 1996-12-31) | 1967-11-08 | ||||
Krzysztof Zajac (until 1996-06-30) | 1958-02-25 | ||||
Sandy Enge (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-06-30 | ||||
5 | Andrew Uwe (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-10-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andreas Boll (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-08-06 | ||||
Alexander Woloschin (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-04-04 | ||||
Timo Ehle (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-11-02 | ||||
Thomas Goch (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-10-04 | ||||
Sven Bremer (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-06-02 | ||||
Patrick Zierott (until 1996-12-31) | 1966-06-25 | ||||
Eckhard Luck (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-03-23 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Collins Etebu (until 1999-12-31) | 1970-04-22 | ||||
Horst Elberfeld (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-09-18 | ||||
Tino Rodehau (until 1996-06-30) | 1976-02-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1996-06-02 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1996-06-09 00:00 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |