Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Eduard Geyer (until 2004-11-23) | 1944-10-07 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hagen Reeck (until 2004-06-30) | 1959-09-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Antonio Ananijew (until 1996-08-31) | 1965-05-08 | ||||
1 | Kay Wehner (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-02-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Sven Benken (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-04-20 | ||||
Jens Melzig (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-09-28 | ||||
3 | Thomas Hossmang (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-11-27 | |||
21 | Willi Kronhardt (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-02-17 | |||
23 | Kay Wenschlag (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-02-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ingolf Schneider (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-11-28 | ||||
Moses Enguelle (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-01-02 | ||||
Brian Gohr (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-09-26 | ||||
Michael Hennig (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-06-04 | ||||
6 | Detlef Irrgang (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-05-27 | |||
7 | Mike Jesse (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-05-01 | |||
8 | Jens-Uwe Zophel (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-06-23 | |||
14 | Jorg Woltmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-11-30 | |||
18 | Igor Lazic (from 1997-01-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-08-08 | |||
20 | Holger Fraedrich (until 1998-12-31) | 1968-08-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Matthias Zimmerling (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-09-06 | ||||
9 | Toralf Konetzke (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-12-10 | |||
17 | Frank Seifert (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-10-02 | |||
28 | Sven Kubis (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-05-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1997-05-29 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1997-06-05 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |