Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Reinhold Fanz (until 1998-12-22) | 1954-01-16 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Thomas Kost (until 2000-01-31) | 1969-05-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jorg Sievers (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Reinhard Stumpf (from 1997-01-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1961-11-26 | ||||
Mathias Kuhlmey (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-02-28 | ||||
Frank Germann (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-08-26 | ||||
Fahed Dermech (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-11-26 | ||||
Uli Borowka (until 1996-12-31) | 1962-05-19 | ||||
2 | Carsten Linke (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-09-19 | |||
3 | Harald Gartner (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-11-30 | |||
6 | Jens Rasiejewski (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-01-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Fabian Ernst (until 1998-06-30) | 1979-05-30 | ||||
Christof Babatz (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-09-03 | ||||
Elard Ostermann (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-10-15 | ||||
Servet Atalan (until 1997-06-30) | 1977-01-01 | ||||
Klaus Ottens (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-01-04 | ||||
10 | Otto Addo (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-06-09 | |||
11 | Dieter Hecking (from 1996-10-16) (until 1999-06-30) | 1964-09-12 | |||
19 | Volkan Arslan (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-08-29 | |||
20 | Damian Brezina (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-11-08 | |||
22 | Matthias Dworschak (from 1997-01-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-04-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Vladan Milovanovic (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-07-07 | ||||
Kreso Kovacec (until 1997-12-31) | 1969-07-20 | ||||
Niclas Weiland (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-07-22 | ||||
Leonardo Manzi (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-04-28 | ||||
14 | Gerald Asamoah (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-10-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1997-05-29 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1997-06-05 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |