Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Franke (until 2000-09-07) | 1944-12-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Antonio Ananijew (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-05-08 | |||
12 | Daniel Frohlich (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-08-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jano Hennig (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-08-19 | ||||
Torsten Bittermann (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-02-03 | ||||
2 | Jan Schmidt (until 1999-12-31) | 1971-02-08 | |||
3 | Thomas Laudeley (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-11-18 | |||
11 | Ulf Mehlhorn (until 2005-06-30) | 1968-06-21 | |||
19 | Marco Franke (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-01-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Sven Kohler (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-02-24 | ||||
Tino Wachtler (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-09-20 | ||||
Andre Krasselt (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-03-08 | ||||
4 | Lutz Wienhold (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-09-15 | |||
6 | Alexander Tetzner (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-08-23 | |||
9 | Jorg Schmidt (until 1999-12-31) | 1970-12-20 | |||
10 | Kay-Uwe Jendrossek (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-10-25 | |||
13 | Hendrik Liebers (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-12-18 | |||
15 | Jens Konig (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-03-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Hrvoje Erceg (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-08-06 | ||||
8 | Mirko Ullmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-06-12 | |||
14 | Ronny Kujat (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-08-05 | |||
16 | Danilo Kunze (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-06-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1999-05-30 20:20 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1999-06-06 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |