Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Vollmann (until 1999-10-06) | 1957-12-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Ischdonat (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-06-09 | |||
22 | Pierre Esser (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-12-04 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Antal Weiszenbacher (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-01-20 | ||||
Jakob Guhn (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-10-30 | ||||
2 | Michael Prus (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-02-04 | |||
4 | Sven Teichmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-10-29 | |||
5 | Vito Milosevic (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-10-12 | |||
15 | Ingo Berens (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-07-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Alexander Leibrock (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-06-21 | ||||
Thomas Richter (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-06-29 | ||||
Michail Smirnow (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-10 | ||||
Abdelaziz Bennij (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-10-08 | ||||
8 | Dirk Fengler (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-03-03 | |||
10 | Rudi Thommes (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-12-17 | |||
12 | Frank Sus (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-12-04 | |||
13 | Reinhold Breu (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-09-12 | |||
14 | Dirk Klinge (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-06-30 | |||
16 | Werner Heinzen (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-05-20 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Vlado Papic (until 1999-12-31) | 1968-09-21 | ||||
Marek Czakon (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-12-01 | ||||
11 | Ermin Melunovic (until 1999-12-31) | 1973-05-18 | |||
29 | Georges Mouyeme (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-04-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1999-06-06 17:15 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1999-06-13 20:15 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |