Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans-Jurgen Boysen (until 1999-10-24) | 1957-05-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Thorsten Rohrbach (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-09-20 | ||||
Andreas Clauss (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-01-13 | ||||
1 | Rene Keffel (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-01-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Dietmar Roth (until 2001-06-30) | 1963-09-16 | ||||
Michael Kopper (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-11-17 | ||||
Dubravko Kolinger (until 2000-10-31) | 1975-11-29 | ||||
Steven Kessler (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-12-13 | ||||
5 | Lars Meyer (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-05-14 | |||
5 | Stefan Dolzer (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-07-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gunther Maier (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-08-26 | ||||
Stefan Ertl (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-04-21 | ||||
Tom Stohn (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-12-21 | ||||
Kai-Uwe Giersch (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-04-08 | ||||
Michael Hartmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-12-06 | ||||
Bernd Gramminger (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-07-08 | ||||
Thomas Winter (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-09-22 | ||||
Frank Kastner (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-11-29 | ||||
6 | Patrick Dama (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-04-05 | |||
10 | Oliver Speth (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-08-03 | |||
11 | Stefan Simon (until 2000-12-31) | 1969-06-18 | |||
14 | Necip Incesu (until 1999-12-31) | 1978-01-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Oliver Roth (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-01-30 | ||||
Dirk Vollmar (until 1999-12-31) | 1972-04-04 | ||||
Paul Koutsoliakos (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-07-03 | ||||
Samuel Taubmann (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-02-18 | ||||
Horst Russ (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-10-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1999-06-06 17:15 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-06-19 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |