Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Radoslav Momirski (until 1970-09-30) | 1919-09-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Burose (until 1971-06-30) | 1945-02-04 | ||||
Udo Bohs (until 1969-06-30) | 1943-08-15 | ||||
Gerhard Krapka (until 1969-06-30) | 1940-09-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Friedhelm Holtgrave (until 1973-06-30) | 1944-07-14 | ||||
Hannes Schaaf (until 1972-06-30) | 1941-07-06 | ||||
Walter Bulik (until 1969-06-30) | 1933-09-17 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Diehl (until 1969-06-30) | 1944-02-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Charly Tripp (until 1974-12-31) | 1944-02-03 | ||||
Herbert Schroder (until 1971-06-30) | 1945-12-22 | ||||
Siegfried Muller (until 1971-06-30) | 1945-07-18 | ||||
Walter Wiethe (until 1971-06-30) | 1940-03-03 | ||||
Gunter Muller (until 1970-06-30) | 1946-11-02 | ||||
Karl Heinz Wobker (until 1970-06-30) | 1940-08-14 | ||||
Reinhard Haseldiek (until 1969-12-31) | 1933-04-26 | ||||
Helmut Bensmann (until 1969-06-30) | 1940-02-19 | ||||
Dieter Fesske (until 1969-06-30) | 1947-07-08 | ||||
Klaus-Peter Timm (until 1969-06-30) | 1948-04-19 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Carsten Baumann (until 1971-06-30) | 1946-10-07 | ||||
Willi Mumme (until 1971-06-30) | 1946-05-29 | ||||
Wolfgang Kaniber (until 1969-06-30) | 1939-11-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1969-05-28 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1969-06-01 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1969-06-04 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1969-06-08 00:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1969-06-11 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1969-06-18 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1969-06-22 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1969-06-25 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |