Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erwin Turk (until 1971-06-30) | 1934-11-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Udo Bohs (until 1972-06-30) | 1943-08-15 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Manfred Waack (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-11-08 | ||||
Hartmut Hischer (until 1973-06-30) | 1947-12-09 | ||||
Gunter Hoffmann (until 1971-06-30) | 1942-03-24 | ||||
Wolfgang Hustig (until 1971-06-30) | 1950-08-01 | ||||
Beyer (until 1971-06-30) | |||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Horst Wohlers (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-08-06 | ||||
Wolfgang Wellnitz (until 1974-06-30) | 1942-02-22 | ||||
Alfred Hussner (until 1973-06-30) | 1950-05-13 | ||||
Erich Roschkowski (until 1972-06-30) | 1949-02-27 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Greth (until 1973-06-30) | 1951-06-17 | ||||
Reinhard Loffler (until 1973-06-30) | 1942-02-22 | ||||
Horst Romes (until 1972-06-30) | 1944-09-05 | ||||
Wolfgang Krontal (until 1971-06-30) | 1947-03-20 | ||||
Herbert Liedtke (until 1971-06-30) | 1950-10-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1971-05-26 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1971-05-30 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1971-06-06 00:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1971-06-09 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1971-06-13 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1971-06-16 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1971-06-20 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1971-06-23 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |