Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Baas (from 1971-05-22) (until 1973-06-30) | 1922-04-13 | ||||
Kurt Baluses (until 1971-05-21) | 1914-06-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Rudi Wimmer (until 1983-06-30) | 1944-01-20 | ||||
Siegfried Kessler (until 1977-06-30) | 1941-03-29 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gunther Fuchs (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-03-01 | ||||
Jurgen Weidlandt (until 1972-06-30) | 1940-09-06 | ||||
David Scheu (until 1972-06-30) | 1947-09-18 | ||||
Eugen Ehmann (until 1971-06-30) | 1945-02-14 | ||||
Friedhelm Groppe (until 1971-06-30) | 1942-10-17 | ||||
Klaus Beckfeld (until 1971-06-30) | 1943-10-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans Haunstein (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-08-07 | ||||
Hans-Dietmar Deinert (until 1971-06-30) | 1948-10-06 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gerd Becker (until 1973-06-30) | 1943-10-18 | ||||
Horst Wild (until 1973-06-30) | 1943-10-04 | ||||
Willi Zander (until 1972-06-30) | 1946-03-05 | ||||
Heiner Hagenbucher (until 1972-06-30) | 1949-06-16 | ||||
Ernst Abbe (until 1971-06-30) | 1948-06-04 | ||||
Walter Szaule (until 1971-06-30) | 1944-11-13 | ||||
Axel Rzany (until 1971-06-30) | 1950-02-27 | ||||
Theo Menkhaus (until 1971-06-30) | 1946-09-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1971-05-26 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1971-05-30 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1971-06-02 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1971-06-06 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1971-06-13 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1971-06-16 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1971-06-23 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1971-06-27 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |