Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Adi Preissler (until 1973-06-30) | 1921-04-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Willi Ertz (until 1981-06-30) | 1943-05-28 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Schroder (until 1975-06-30) | 1944-04-11 | ||||
Marcel Perriot (until 1972-06-30) | 1948-08-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Norbert Hess (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-03-11 | ||||
Reiner Brinsa (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-08-01 | ||||
Heinz Histing (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-09-14 | ||||
Werner Martin (until 1972-06-30) | 1949-02-28 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerd Schley (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-09-13 | ||||
Hans-Gunter Muller (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-03-30 | ||||
Erich Hermesdorf (until 1972-06-30) | 1944-11-12 | ||||
Jurgen Muller (until 1972-06-30) | 1950-02-25 | ||||
Dieter Schmidt (until 1972-06-30) | 1947-02-04 | ||||
Gunter Kuntz (until 1972-06-30) | 1938-11-28 | ||||
Gerd Zewe (until 1972-06-30) | 1950-06-13 | ||||
Gerd Siedl (until 1972-06-30) | 1953-04-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ludwig Lang (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-02-09 | ||||
Jurgen Pontes (until 1974-06-30) | 1947-07-27 | ||||
Jochen Dries (until 1972-06-30) | 1947-02-24 | ||||
Hugo Dausmann (until 1972-06-30) | 1942-09-12 | ||||
Horst Brand (until 1972-06-30) | 1946-01-01 | ||||
Jurgen Papies (until 1972-06-30) | 1944-04-22 | ||||
Hans-Werner Bettinger (until 1972-06-30) | 1948-01-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 1972-05-22 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-05-31 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1972-06-04 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-06-07 00:00 |
10 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-06-14 00:00 |
4 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1972-06-17 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-06-21 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1972-06-25 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |