Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Slobodan Cendic (from 1972-01-01) (until 1972-06-30) | 1938-08-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Horst Grunenberg (until 1973-06-30) | 1942-06-19 | ||||
Hans Hauser (until 1973-06-30) | 1949-05-17 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Lothar Gross (until 1973-06-30) | 1940-02-10 | ||||
Ivan Sangulin (until 1972-06-30) | 1938-04-20 | ||||
Klaus Walleitner (until 1972-06-30) | 1947-09-12 | ||||
Gunter Blume (until 1972-06-30) | 1941-11-23 | ||||
Joachim Thiel (until 1972-06-30) | 1951-08-07 | ||||
Detlef Pewestorf (until 1972-06-30) | 1952-09-28 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Schulz (until 1973-06-30) | 1952-10-06 | ||||
Bernd Frati (until 1973-06-30) | 1945-06-01 | ||||
Helmut Nerlinger (until 1972-06-30) | 1948-02-27 | ||||
Heinz Schonberger (until 1972-06-30) | 1949-12-30 | ||||
Jonny Egbuono (until 1972-06-30) | 1944-07-20 | ||||
Georg Jung (until 1972-06-30) | 1946-08-04 | ||||
Norbert Siegmann (until 1972-06-30) | 1953-05-20 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wulf-Ingo Usbeck (until 1973-06-30) | 1943-11-04 | ||||
Werner Ipta (until 1972-06-30) | 1942-03-18 | ||||
Hans Bernrieder (until 1972-06-30) | 1941-11-04 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Hecker (until 1972-06-30) | 1946-08-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 1972-05-22 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1972-05-28 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1972-06-04 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-06-07 00:00 |
10 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1972-06-11 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-06-14 00:00 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1972-06-17 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-06-21 00:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |