Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erwin Turk (until 1973-06-30) | 1934-11-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Werner Kamper (until 1976-06-30) | 1943-08-14 | ||||
Rainer Schowe (until 1974-06-30) | 1946-11-05 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Klaus Baumanns (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-09-15 | ||||
Heinz Koch (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-09-03 | ||||
Jurgen Wohlgemuth (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-10-13 | ||||
Friedhelm Holtgrave (until 1973-06-30) | 1944-07-14 | ||||
Hannes Schaaf (until 1972-06-30) | 1941-07-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hannes Kaumkotter (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-02-14 | ||||
Charly Tripp (until 1974-12-31) | 1944-02-03 | ||||
Gerhard Elfert (until 1973-06-30) | 1942-09-06 | ||||
Reinhard Wasner (until 1973-06-30) | 1945-01-15 | ||||
Fritz Lehmann (until 1972-06-30) | 1946-03-10 | ||||
Hubert Huring (until 1972-06-30) | 1950-05-27 | ||||
Erwin Braun (until 1972-06-30) | 1949-11-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Karl-Heinz Leufgen (until 1973-06-30) | 1947-01-27 | ||||
Gunter Karbowiak (until 1973-06-30) | 1949-03-05 | ||||
Volker Graul (until 1972-12-31) | 1952-06-18 | ||||
Dieter Baumanns (until 1972-06-30) | 1948-09-15 | ||||
Hans Fritsche (until 1972-06-30) | 1950-03-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1972-05-28 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-05-31 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1972-06-04 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-06-07 00:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1972-06-11 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1972-06-17 00:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-06-21 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1972-06-25 00:00 |
4 : 3 |
Schema Compare |