Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Buhtz (until 1974-10-20) | 1923-09-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Manfred Muller (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-07-28 | ||||
Willi Janzik (until 1972-06-30) | 1941-04-04 | ||||
Rudolf Kratschmer (until 1972-06-30) | 1945-05-07 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jurgen-Michael Galbierz (until 1977-12-31) | 1950-02-07 | ||||
Manfred Cremer (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-10-28 | ||||
Erich Miss (until 1975-06-30) | 1948-03-16 | ||||
Emil Meisen (until 1974-06-30) | 1939-11-12 | ||||
Manfred Reichert (until 1974-06-30) | 1940-10-28 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Bernhard Hermes (until 1978-09-15) | 1945-09-08 | ||||
Heinz-Dieter Lomm (until 1975-06-30) | 1943-10-18 | ||||
Herbert Stockl (until 1975-06-30) | 1946-01-25 | ||||
Jurgen Kohle (until 1974-06-30) | 1943-01-05 | ||||
Hermann Straschitz (until 1972-06-30) | 1940-08-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gunter Propper (until 1979-06-30) | 1941-12-08 | ||||
Gustav Jung (until 1975-06-30) | 1945-06-04 | ||||
Claus Brune (until 1973-06-30) | 1949-10-01 | ||||
Detlef Webers (until 1973-06-30) | 1949-09-13 | ||||
Hans Jurgen Lehr (until 1972-06-30) | 1947-09-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 1972-05-22 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1972-05-28 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-05-31 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-06-07 00:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1972-06-11 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1972-06-14 00:00 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1972-06-17 00:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1972-06-25 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |