Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Karl-Heinz Mulhausen (until 1974-06-30) | 1937-06-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Klaus-Georg Christensen (until 1974-06-30) | 1945-03-02 | ||||
Benno Larsen (until 1974-06-30) | 1949-09-30 | ||||
Axel Lange (until 1974-06-30) | 1943-09-29 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Manfred Waack (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-11-08 | ||||
Harald Munster (until 1975-06-30) | 1947-10-25 | ||||
Gerd Wieczorkowski (until 1974-06-30) | 1948-07-24 | ||||
Hartmut Hischer (until 1973-06-30) | 1947-12-09 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Rolf Hofert (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-02-08 | ||||
Horst Wohlers (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-08-06 | ||||
Wolfgang Wellnitz (until 1974-06-30) | 1942-02-22 | ||||
Alfred Hussner (until 1973-06-30) | 1950-05-13 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Horst Neumann (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-11-05 | ||||
Ulrich Schulz (until 1974-10-31) | 1946-11-11 | ||||
Franz Gerber (until 1974-06-30) | 1953-11-27 | ||||
Werner Nickel (until 1974-06-30) | 1951-08-11 | ||||
Walter Dobberkau (until 1974-06-30) | 1949-02-13 | ||||
Werner Greth (until 1973-06-30) | 1951-06-17 | ||||
Siegfried Bronnert (from 1973-01-01) (until 1973-06-30) | 1944-09-06 | ||||
Reinhard Loffler (until 1973-06-30) | 1942-02-22 | ||||
Siegfried Beyer (until 1973-06-30) | 1943-07-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1973-05-23 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1973-05-27 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1973-05-30 00:00 |
2 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1973-06-03 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1973-06-10 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1973-06-13 00:00 |
4 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1973-06-17 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1973-06-24 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |