Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erwin Turk (until 1975-05-06) | 1934-11-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Willi Ertz (until 1981-06-30) | 1943-05-28 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Schroder (until 1975-06-30) | 1944-04-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Norbert Hess (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-03-11 | ||||
Reiner Brinsa (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-08-01 | ||||
Heinz Histing (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-09-14 | ||||
Klaus Bischoff (until 1975-06-30) | 1953-11-23 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Heinz Henkes (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-05-02 | ||||
Hans-Werner Eichhorn (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-08-25 | ||||
Gerd Schley (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-09-13 | ||||
Peter Bellaire (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-10-08 | ||||
Peter Drenks (until 1975-06-30) | 1950-01-24 | ||||
Hans-Gunter Muller (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-03-30 | ||||
Rainer Reuther (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-12-08 | ||||
Paul Bajlitz (until 1974-08-31) | 1951-12-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ludwig Lang (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-02-09 | ||||
Horst Schauss (until 1975-06-30) | 1945-11-06 | ||||
Jurgen Pontes (until 1974-06-30) | 1947-07-27 | ||||
Gunter Jung (until 1974-06-30) | 1949-09-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1974-05-09 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1974-05-16 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1974-05-19 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1974-05-22 00:00 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1974-05-29 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-06-01 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1974-06-05 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-06-08 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |