Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Milovan Beljin (until 1975-06-30) | 1936-09-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Hans Hauser (until 1975-06-30) | 1949-05-17 | ||||
Georg Mogele (until 1975-06-30) | 1940-01-30 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Heiner Schuhmann (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-11-04 | ||||
Klaus Walleitner (from 1973-10-01) (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-09-12 | ||||
Claus Brandmair (until 1976-06-30) | 1953-05-21 | ||||
Alwin Fink (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-01-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Haug (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-12-24 | ||||
Herbert Hobusch (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-01-29 | ||||
Klaus Vohringer (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-06-01 | ||||
Helmut Haller (until 1976-06-30) | 1939-07-21 | ||||
Georg Schnurrer (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-02-04 | ||||
Walter Schwab (until 1974-06-30) | 1944-10-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hans Jorg (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-11-04 | ||||
Edgar Schneider (from 1973-11-16) (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-08-17 | ||||
Karl Obermeier (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-09-08 | ||||
Erich Weixler (until 1975-06-30) | 1945-09-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1974-05-09 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1974-05-12 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1974-05-16 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1974-05-22 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-05-25 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1974-05-29 00:00 |
4 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-06-01 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1974-06-08 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |