Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainerin | |||||
Christina Schellenberg (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-02-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Natascha May (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-05-31 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Anna Grimm (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-06-16 | |||
3 | Mara Grimm (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-07-08 | |||
15 | Annika Komm (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-07-21 | |||
22 | Leonie Haberacker (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-06-05 | |||
24 | Nina Hirsch (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-01-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Julia Kohl (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-12-17 | ||||
Linda Rabe (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-05-31 | ||||
Mona Schomber (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-02-03 | ||||
8 | Meike Kellermann (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-08-22 | |||
9 | Meike Wischgoll (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-06-19 | |||
10 | Julia Bruckner (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-05-18 | |||
11 | Angelika Rossler (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-07-19 | |||
12 | Anna Hofrichter (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-07-20 | |||
16 | Ellen Riess (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-12-08 | |||
17 | Sara Hofmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-11-24 | |||
20 | Christina Schellenberg (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-02-20 | |||
21 | Maren Haberacker (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-06-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
4 | Elisa Schumann (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-11-25 | |||
16 | Ellen Riess (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-12-08 | |||
18 | Nina Heisel (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-12-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2018-05-21 14:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2018-05-27 14:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2018-06-03 14:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |