Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Vojkan Vukmirovic (from 2022-04-01) (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Goran Melher (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Mario Matijevic (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-11-07 | ||||
Miodrag Aksentijevic (until 2022-06-30) | 1983-07-22 | ||||
Feldspieler | |||||
Marcel Diethelm (from 2022-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-05-21 | ||||
Davud Vehab (from 2022-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-12-09 | ||||
Ante Ljubic (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-10-16 | ||||
Manuel Fischer (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-09-19 | ||||
Gjokica-Djo Arsovski (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-04-29 | ||||
Sasa Babic (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-08-04 | ||||
Zeljko Babic (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-06-01 | ||||
Luka Bevanda (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-11-09 | ||||
Srdan Ivankovic (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-01-25 | ||||
Dragoslav Matosevic (until 2022-06-30) | 1968-04-20 | ||||
Adrijan Micevski (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-11-30 | ||||
Josip Sesar (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-10-16 | ||||
Marko Suton (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-02-18 | ||||
Kresimir Trepsic (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-08-12 | ||||
Amer Dzindic (from 2021-12-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-07-29 | ||||
Konstantinos Kostidis (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-06-03 | ||||
Demian Anic (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-11-06 | ||||
Vojislav Jovanovic (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-03-22 | ||||
Danjel Knezevic (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-07-19 | ||||
David Matkovic (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1983-10-26 | ||||
Ivan Knezovic (until 2021-12-31) | 1991-06-19 | ||||
Hrvoje Kuninec (until 2021-12-31) | 1992-11-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-06-26 11:00 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-06-27 15:00 |
9 : 0 |
Schema Compare |