Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Steffen Baumgart (until 2023-06-30) | 1972-01-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Andre Pawlak (until 2022-06-30) | 1971-02-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marvin Schwabe | 1995-04-25 | |||
1 | Timo Horn (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-05-12 | |||
40 | Jonas Urbig (until 2023-01-06) | 2003-08-08 | |||
44 | Matthias Kobbing (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-08-25 | |||
44 | Matthias Kobbing (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-08-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Benno Schmitz (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-11-17 | |||
3 | Kristian Pedersen (from 2022-07-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-08-04 | |||
4 | Timo Hubers | 1996-07-20 | |||
4 | Timo Hubers (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-07-20 | |||
5 | Bright Akwo Arrey-Mbi (until 2022-08-29) | 2003-03-26 | |||
15 | Luca Kilian (from 2022-07-01) | 1999-09-01 | |||
15 | Luca Kilian (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-09-01 | |||
19 | Kingsley Ehizibue (until 2022-08-29) | 1995-05-25 | |||
23 | Jannes Horn (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-02-06 | |||
24 | Julian Chabot (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-02-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Georg Strauch (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-30 | ||||
Damion Downs (from 2022-07-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-07-06 | ||||
6 | Eric Martel (from 2022-07-01) | 2002-04-29 | |||
7 | Dejan Ljubicic | 1997-10-08 | |||
8 | Denis Huseinbasic (from 2022-07-01) | 2001-07-03 | |||
11 | Florian Kainz | 1992-10-24 | |||
11 | Kingsley Schindler (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-07-12 | |||
14 | Jonas Hector (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-05-27 | |||
18 | Ondrej Duda (until 2023-01-29) | 1994-12-15 | |||
21 | Salih Ozcan (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-01-11 | |||
21 | Louis Schaub (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-12-29 | |||
25 | Tim Lemperle (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-05 | |||
28 | Ellyes Skhiri (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-05-10 | |||
30 | Marvin Obuz (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-01-25 | |||
31 | Tomas Ostrak (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-02-05 | |||
36 | Niklas Hauptmann (until 2022-08-30) | 1996-06-27 | |||
37 | Linton Maina (from 2022-07-01) | 1999-06-23 | |||
42 | Dimitris Limnios (from 2022-07-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-05-27 | |||
47 | Mathias Olesen (until 2024-01-23) | 2001-03-21 | |||
47 | Mathias Olesen (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Maximilian Schmid (from 2022-07-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-05 | ||||
9 | Sebastian Andersson (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-07-15 | |||
13 | Mark Uth | 1991-08-24 | |||
13 | Mark Uth (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-08-24 | |||
19 | Dimitris Limnios (until 2023-12-31) | 1998-05-27 | |||
21 | Steffen Tigges (from 2022-07-01) | 1998-07-31 | |||
23 | Sargis Adamjan (from 2022-07-01) | 1993-05-23 | |||
27 | Anthony Modeste (until 2022-08-07) | 1988-04-14 | |||
29 | Jan Thielmann | 2002-05-26 | |||
33 | Florian Dietz (from 2022-07-01) | 1998-08-03 | |||
33 | Florian Dietz (from 2022-07-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-08-03 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Marvin Obuz (from 2022-07-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-01-25 | ||||
Noah Katterbach (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-04-13 | ||||
Jens Castrop (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-29 | ||||
Yann-Aurel Bisseck (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-11-29 | ||||
Dimitris Limnios (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-05-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2022-08-18 20:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2022-08-25 19:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |