Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Oliver Zapel (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1968-01-15 | ||||
Daniel Safadi (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
12 | Andrea Hoxha (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-09-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Dustin Thiel (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-05-17 | |||
5 | Sean Paul Vinberg (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-09-29 | |||
8 | Morten Knudsen (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-04-28 | |||
13 | Lucas Steen (from 2021-09-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-06-13 | |||
15 | Kenny Korup (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-02-12 | |||
17 | Alex Hammerschmidt (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-08-15 | |||
17 | Christophe van Zutphen (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
24 | Elias Tamburini (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-02-01 | |||
29 | Hendrik Wurr (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gianluca Stoll Giovanella (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-02-17 | ||||
2 | Conor-Jonathan Gnerlich (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-11-03 | |||
3 | Nico Fischer (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-05-10 | |||
6 | Bjorn Lambach (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-12-01 | |||
7 | Fabian Graudenz (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-01-16 | |||
9 | Michael Kobert (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-03-14 | |||
10 | Haris Hyseni (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-09-14 | |||
10 | Haris Hyseni (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-09-14 | |||
11 | Abdullah Abou Rashed (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-08-07 | |||
12 | Niklas Grunitz (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-02-17 | |||
16 | Gerret Grage (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-03-19 | |||
16 | Sebastian Pingel (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-05-11 | |||
17 | Abdelmajid Bouali (from 2021-10-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-12-14 | |||
18 | Murat Rasgele (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-01-18 | |||
20 | Nestor Djengoue (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-04-26 | |||
20 | Fares Hadj (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
21 | Sam-Calvin Kisekka (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-05-27 | |||
22 | Maurice Maletzki (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-09-08 | |||
22 | Saibo Ibraimo (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-06-03 | |||
23 | Sahid Wahab (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-02-08 | |||
24 | Kubilay Buyukdemir (until 2021-12-31) | 1997-08-06 | |||
25 | Daoud Iraqi (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-09-13 | |||
26 | Arnold Budimbu (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-02-20 | |||
27 | Corvin Bock | 1999-01-13 | |||
30 | Kusi Kwame (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-08-09 | |||
31 | Kevin Hubner (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-06-06 | |||
32 | Kevin Tittel (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-02-04 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Dominik Wüst (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-04-29 | |||
19 | Luca Aouci (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-08-23 | |||
25 | Ramazan Acer (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-04-05 | |||
29 | Yassine Bouchama (until 2021-10-05) |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2021-08-13 19:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-08-18 19:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-08-21 14:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-08-28 13:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-09-01 19:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-09-05 14:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-11 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-09-19 14:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-25 13:00 |
1 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-10-01 19:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-16 13:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-24 14:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-30 13:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2021-11-02 19:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-07 14:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-14 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-20 13:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-27 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-12-10 19:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-06 14:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-12 13:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-20 13:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |