Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Martin Polomka (until 2022-06-30) | 1982-11-20 | ||||
Vural Tasdelen (from 2022-01-30) (until 2022-06-30) | 1976-07-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Sascha Algermissen (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-09-13 | |||
28 | Kilian Neufeld (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-03-19 | |||
29 | Benjamin Ortner (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-01-09 | |||
30 | Leon Frelke (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Tom Kinitz (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-09-23 | |||
2 | Erik Henschel (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-10-04 | |||
3 | Stephane Ngongang (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-09-01 | |||
3 | Niko Vukancic (until 2022-01-30) | 2002-02-16 | |||
4 | Fabian Weigel (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-02-26 | |||
14 | Marcel Langer (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-02-16 | |||
15 | Francis Adomah (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-06-29 | |||
17 | Marko Ilic (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-05-31 | |||
21 | Yannick Bahls (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-03-14 | |||
27 | Denis Vukancic (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-02-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Pascal Gos (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-08-15 | |||
6 | Besmir Rada (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-08-25 | |||
9 | Can Gokdemir (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-10-06 | |||
10 | Martin Wiederhold (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-02-16 | |||
12 | Gürkan Öney (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-11-28 | |||
12 | Leander Baar (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-07-14 | |||
13 | Fabian Vy-Ngoc (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-02-18 | |||
14 | Igor Antunovic (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-02-25 | |||
15 | Marin Selak (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
16 | Ibrahim Aktekin (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-07-11 | |||
19 | Aladin Capli (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-01-10 | |||
22 | Ayhan Cankor (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-12-13 | |||
22 | Max Kummer (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-11-27 | |||
27 | Ebrahim Farahnak (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-01-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Melvin Zimmermann (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-07-29 | |||
11 | Christopher Schultz (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-06-01 | |||
17 | Marvin Ibekwe (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-10-11 | |||
23 | Jovan Hoffart (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-05-21 | |||
23 | Emro Curic (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-07-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2021-08-13 19:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-08-22 15:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-08-29 15:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-04 18:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-09-19 15:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-25 15:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-09-29 19:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-02 16:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-10 15:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-17 15:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-24 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-06 15:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-14 14:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-21 14:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-11-24 19:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-28 14:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-12-05 14:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-12-12 14:00 |
7 : 1 |
Schema Compare |