Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Nolan (until 2022-06-30) | 1981-11-13 | ||||
Oliver Reck (until 2022-06-30) | 1965-02-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Felix Bohe (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-09-05 | |||
12 | Marcel Bergmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-05-13 | |||
25 | Tom-Lukas Buenting (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-06-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Nick Otto (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-05-27 | |||
4 | Niklas-Leon von Aschwege (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-08-28 | |||
5 | Konstantin Engel (from 2021-07-04) (until 2024-06-30) | 1988-07-27 | |||
6 | Michel Leon Hahn | 1998-05-20 | |||
17 | Peer Wegener (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-03-08 | |||
27 | Dennis Behrens (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1983-07-06 | |||
37 | Marc Augé (from 2021-07-04) (until 2023-01-31) | 2001-03-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Almir Ziga (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-05-12 | |||
6 | Michel Leon Hahn (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-05-20 | |||
7 | Bastian Schaffer (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-12-12 | |||
10 | Ibrahim Temin (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-09-21 | |||
15 | Alex Chiarodia (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-04-26 | |||
16 | Kevin Samide (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-05-17 | |||
18 | Julian Bennert (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-10-02 | |||
19 | Gentuar Durmishi (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-12-17 | |||
20 | Marcel Andrijanic (from 2022-06-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-10-21 | |||
20 | Bent Janssen (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-06-20 | |||
22 | Max Benjamin Falldorf (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-03-07 | |||
27 | Elario Ghassan (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-03-30 | |||
30 | Chris David (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-03-06 | |||
33 | Muhittin Basturk (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-01-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Mario Fredehorst (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-04-29 | |||
9 | Miguel Fernandes (until 2022-01-03) | 1997-01-13 | |||
11 | Kifuta Makangu (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-01-08 | |||
13 | Julius Zaher (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-12-03 | |||
14 | Shaun Minns (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-03-11 | |||
24 | Fred MC Mensah Quarshie (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-03-29 | |||
39 | Antonio Verinac (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-12-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-08-14 15:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-08-22 15:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-04 15:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-18 15:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-09-22 19:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-25 15:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-02 15:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-10-06 16:45 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-09 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-17 13:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-23 15:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-30 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-06 14:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-13 15:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-11-19 19:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-28 14:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-12-04 14:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-12-11 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |