Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Lars Jagemann (until 2022-06-30) | 1968-12-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Fynn Hegerfeldt (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-24 | |||
27 | Julian Quack (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-05-29 | |||
30 | Patrick Siefkes | 1990-01-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Daniel Owusu (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-08-03 | |||
3 | Tjorve Mohr (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-26 | |||
4 | Nikola Serra (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-01-05 | |||
4 | Lias Patjens (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-08-19 | |||
5 | Arian Khodabakhshian (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-01-13 | |||
12 | Nico Mau (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-06-14 | |||
16 | Ashton Gotz (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-07-16 | |||
22 | Tom Kinitz (from 2022-06-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-09-23 | |||
22 | Hassan El-Saleh (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-01-13 | |||
24 | Jean-Philippe Meibohm (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-09-29 | |||
25 | Nick Dehde (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-07-20 | |||
26 | Liam Giwah (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-01-14 | |||
31 | Finn Zeugner (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Bennet Wittig (from 2022-06-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-02-09 | ||||
Julian Budde (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-06-02 | ||||
3 | Stig Hartig (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-06-06 | |||
6 | Jorik Wulff (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-04-22 | |||
7 | Jannes Elfers (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-10-11 | |||
8 | Milan Schweiger (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
8 | Niklas Golke (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-12-20 | |||
9 | Felix Niebergall (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-07-26 | |||
10 | Florian Nagel (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-03-13 | |||
11 | Jasper Goossen (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-11-17 | |||
13 | Sebastian Haut (from 2022-06-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-01-23 | |||
17 | Martin Sattler (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-09-13 | |||
20 | Oliver Ioannou (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-04-06 | |||
21 | Dimitri Fiks (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-10-27 | |||
23 | Maximilian Benjamin Geissen (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-03 | |||
28 | Christian Rusch (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-04-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Max Reichardt (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-03-13 | |||
11 | Fabian von Essen (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-10-07 | |||
14 | Alexander Neumann (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-08-13 | |||
15 | Fabio Manuel Dias (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-10-28 | |||
19 | Lennard Fock (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-03-01 | |||
21 | Jan-Miklas Steffens (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-12-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2021-08-15 13:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-08-22 15:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-08-25 19:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-08-28 17:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-09-01 19:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-09-05 15:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-09-12 15:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-09-17 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-09-24 19:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-10-01 19:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-10 15:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2021-10-15 19:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-24 14:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-31 14:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-06 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-14 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-21 14:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-28 14:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-12-04 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-01-29 14:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2022-02-11 19:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-26 15:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |