Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Kristian Arambasic (until 2023-06-30) | 1977-08-05 | ||||
Andreas Golombek (until 2022-06-30) | 1968-08-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Phil Wilhelm (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-06-20 | ||||
1 | Maciej Czyzniewski (until 2023-06-30) | 1985-08-04 | |||
1 | Josip Galic (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-01-25 | |||
21 | Flemming Niemann (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-08-07 | |||
21 | Max-Niklas Milde (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Daniel Haritonov (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-04-14 | |||
4 | Marco Kaffenberger (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-07-09 | |||
6 | Jan Roschlaub (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-12-11 | |||
17 | Julijan Popovic (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-06-15 | |||
22 | Joel Schallschmidt (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
25 | Angelos Argyris (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-05-06 | |||
26 | Alexander Nandzik (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-09-12 | |||
27 | Landry Imboula (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
31 | Pierre Becken (until 2023-06-30) | 1987-09-28 | |||
32 | Marcel Schillmöller (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Firas Romdhane (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-08-03 | ||||
5 | Serkan Temin (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-03-05 | |||
7 | Niklas Kiene (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-18 | |||
10 | Josip Tomic (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-07-16 | |||
11 | Kamer Krasniqi (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-01-11 | |||
16 | David Kinner (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
17 | Ismet Osmani (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-12-21 | |||
22 | Emeraude Betani-Baku (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-06-01 | |||
23 | Moussa Alawie (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-11-29 | |||
30 | Kubilay Buyukdemir (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-08-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Emre Yesilova (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-12-30 | |||
8 | Bocar Djumo (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-08-21 | |||
9 | Shamsu Mansaray (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-17 | |||
9 | Alen Suljevic (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-06-13 | |||
13 | Addy Menga (until 2022-06-30) | 1983-09-28 | |||
20 | Kevin Coleman (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-03-01 | |||
20 | Jiří Miker (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-04-01 | |||
24 | Jaroslaw Lindner (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-06-28 | |||
30 | Michael Seaton (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-05-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-03-05 15:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-12 14:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-19 15:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-26 17:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-02 15:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-09 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-04-24 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-30 15:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-05-08 14:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-05-14 15:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-05-22 14:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-05-29 14:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |