Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Joachim Philipkowski (until 2022-06-30) | 1962-02-26 | ||||
Benjamin Olde (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dennis Smarsch (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-14 | |||
1 | Viktor Weber (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-12-16 | |||
12 | Soren Ahlers (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-09-09 | |||
12 | Jesper Heim (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-01-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Marius Mohr (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-02-11 | ||||
2 | Jannes Wieckhoff (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-08-02 | |||
4 | Lars Ritzka (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-05-07 | |||
4 | Hugo Miguel Santos Teixeira (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-02-24 | |||
14 | Niklas Jessen (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-09-04 | |||
15 | Luca Gunther (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-11-14 | |||
20 | Yi-Young Park (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-06-29 | |||
21 | Berkay Dogan (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-05-18 | |||
23 | Maximilian Schutt (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-20 | |||
24 | Marcel Beifus (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-10-27 | |||
24 | Adam Dźwigała (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-09-25 | |||
31 | Justin Plautz (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-04-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mika Stuhlmacher (until 2023-01-30) | 2002-11-02 | ||||
Justin Seven (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-08-18 | ||||
6 | Bujar Sejdija (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-07-27 | |||
6 | Jakob Munzner (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-03-14 | |||
8 | Max Brandt (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-06-02 | |||
10 | Tom Kankowski (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-15 | |||
10 | Max Düwel (until 2023-01-25) | 2003-04-10 | |||
10 | Lukas Daschner (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-10-01 | |||
13 | Franz Roggow (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-07-14 | |||
13 | Nathanael Kukanda (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-06 | |||
13 | Finn Ole Becker (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-06-08 | |||
16 | Niclas Tibor Nadj (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-12-24 | |||
16 | Igor Matanovic (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-31 | |||
30 | Gwangin Lee (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-07-01 | |||
46 | Maximilian Franzke (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-03-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Bleron Ademi (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-24 | ||||
7 | John Posselt (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-12-31 | |||
7 | Bennet van den Berg (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-05-04 | |||
9 | Serkan Dursun (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-01-30 | |||
15 | Jakub Bednarczyk (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-02 | |||
20 | Lasse Sortehaug (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-05-20 | |||
22 | Luis Steiger Borrero (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-04-17 | |||
22 | Aurel Loubongo-M'Boungou (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-06-19 | |||
24 | Serhat Imsak (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-07-20 | |||
24 | Etienne Amenyido (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-03-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-03-06 15:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-03-13 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-19 15:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-03-27 14:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-02 15:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-04-10 14:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-04-24 14:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-05-01 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-05-08 14:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-05-15 15:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-05-22 14:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-05-28 15:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |