Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Hans-Ulrich Grapenthin (until 1989-06-30) | 1943-09-02 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Lothar Kurbjuweit (until 1989-09-15) | 1950-11-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Perry Brautigam (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-03-28 | ||||
Holger Hunsche (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-12-14 | ||||
Andreas Drechsler (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-08-24 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jens-Uwe Penzel (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-11-14 | ||||
Thomas Ludwig (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-06-21 | ||||
Henning Burger (from 1989-01-01) (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-12-16 | ||||
Heiko Peschke (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-09-18 | ||||
Michael Stolz (until 1990-12-31) | 1966-10-19 | ||||
Ronald Szepanski (until 1989-09-10) | 1966-05-16 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mario Roser (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-12-23 | ||||
Olaf Holetschek (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-07-12 | ||||
Jurgen Raab (until 1993-06-30) | 1958-12-20 | ||||
Stefan Meixner (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-10-13 | ||||
Stefan Boger (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-06-01 | ||||
Mathias Pittelkow (until 1989-12-31) | 1961-12-31 | ||||
Steffen Zipfel (until 1989-12-31) | 1965-01-13 | ||||
Andreas Krause (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-07-30 | ||||
Wolfgang Schilling (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-03-18 | ||||
Oliver Merkel (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-02-13 | ||||
Bernd Lindrath (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-09-13 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Heiko Weber (until 1999-08-31) | 1965-06-26 | ||||
Henry Lesser (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-05-08 | ||||
Robert Zimmermann (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-05-21 | ||||
Ralf Strasser (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-06-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1988-09-07 00:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-10-05 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-10-26 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-11-09 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |