Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Freddy Kaps (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-05-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Tyler Dogan (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-11-08 | |||
1 | Lio Mark Rothenhagen (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-08-31 | |||
13 | Lukas Meßfeldt (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-06-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Joris Mats Bente (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-08-27 | ||||
4 | Philipp Buchholz (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gisbert Richard Zokpa (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-09 | ||||
Ben Wucherpfennig (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-26 | ||||
Eke Alko (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-11-20 | ||||
Henrie Müller-Kalthoff (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-12 | ||||
Youri von der Mehden (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-06-19 | ||||
Ali Jamil Abdulla (from 2022-01-30) (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
5 | Leon Steffen (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-03 | |||
6 | Burak Keskin (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-17 | |||
7 | Efekan Calikoglu (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-12 | |||
8 | Ali Hrnjicic (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-10-16 | |||
10 | Tim Jansa (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-21 | |||
11 | Ikem Ugoh (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-11 | |||
12 | Fobissiè Saagon Youdjen Fobissiè (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-09 | |||
14 | Joshua Nwokoma (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-28 | |||
15 | Leif Kilian Thomsen (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-09-07 | |||
16 | Manuel Schmitz (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-09 | |||
17 | Luka Tunjic (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-11-19 | |||
18 | Joenne Frederic Freese (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-03 | |||
19 | Nils Poggensee (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-01-15 | |||
19 | Mika Gutovsky (from 2022-02-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-02 | |||
21 | Devran Boztepe (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-30 | |||
22 | Luca Marvin Rathmann (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-14 | |||
23 | Paskal Konrad Meyer (from 2021-07-03) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-08-14 11:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-08-28 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-11 13:00 |
6 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-18 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-25 15:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-02 11:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-10 14:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-30 11:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-06 11:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-20 11:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-12-05 11:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-13 11:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-26 11:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-05 11:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-12 11:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-03-20 11:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-04-03 11:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-09 12:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-23 13:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |