Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Schulz (until 2023-06-30) | 1986-02-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jaden Rodtnick (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-20 | |||
12 | Marvin Kopp (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tim Blaszczak (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Aurel Dovenon (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Mekhi Gray (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Simon Jacob (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Lennox Lebelt (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Moritz Polte (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Bruno Rehfeld (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Theodor Sakoufakis (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Noah Salaske (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Leon Sommer (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Romeo Trinko (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Emre Üstün (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Tom Wisbereit (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Emil Zühlke (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Gennaro Mewes (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
2 | Lennard Lämmerhirt (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-14 | |||
3 | Andrik Markgraf (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-07 | |||
4 | Miguel Beck (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-04 | |||
5 | Leon Prosche (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
5 | Oskar Wardau (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-27 | |||
6 | Finn Hoffmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-06 | |||
7 | Enes-Ayberk Gündüz (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-06-14 | |||
8 | Silvio Termini (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-23 | |||
9 | Levis Asanji (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
10 | Bernard Pick (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-13 | |||
11 | William Giegold (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-22 | |||
13 | Julien Friedrich (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
14 | Simon Hauck (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-08-06 | |||
17 | Ahmad Badran (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
18 | Eligius Hounsa (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-09-13 | |||
19 | Malik Mawd (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-08-21 | |||
20 | Musa Alkan (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
20 | Kelvin Oluwasijibomi Ojo (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
20 | Salih Gülvardar (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
21 | Shamil Zirarov (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-18 | |||
22 | Yevhenii Beresh (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-08-25 | |||
23 | Jerome Kortebusch (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-24 | |||
24 | Laurin Schönwald (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-08-14 13:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-08-20 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-08-27 12:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-09-04 12:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-09-24 13:30 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-09-27 16:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-01 13:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-22 15:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-29 13:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-05 13:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-12 11:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-11-20 13:00 |
2 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-12-03 13:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-12-10 13:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2023-02-26 12:00 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-04 13:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-11 13:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |