Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dirk Lehmann (until 2022-06-30) | 1971-08-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jordy Steins (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Titus Jakob (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-08-15 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Aland Abdi (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-05-05 | ||||
Adnane-Askia Abdulaye Issa (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-04-16 | ||||
Imad Al Habaui (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-06 | ||||
Luan Braun (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Firat Celik (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-01-28 | ||||
Kerem Colak (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-03-28 | ||||
Gabriel de Muyter (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-08-11 | ||||
Karim Dhouib (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-06-26 | ||||
Ajdin Eglenovic (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-05-30 | ||||
Quassim El-Akrouche (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Fynn Ellermann (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-07-08 | ||||
Alem Fejzic (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-11-10 | ||||
Mika Frenzen (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-09 | ||||
Jason Harding (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-23 | ||||
Deagir Ilunga (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-10-28 | ||||
Niklas Kampa (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-06-10 | ||||
Travis Kpegouni (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-05-27 | ||||
Jannis Kuckertz (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-17 | ||||
Jens Can Mohren (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-06-13 | ||||
Julian Neuss (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-24 | ||||
Niklas Rixgens (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-13 | ||||
Philipp Rosnersky (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-27 | ||||
Benedikt Roßmüller (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-10 | ||||
Mathias Jean-Marc Sarlette (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-10-04 | ||||
Luca Samir Schmidt (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-11-07 | ||||
Adrian Yanga Mboyo (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-04-10 | ||||
Julian Esser (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-24 | ||||
Betim Sylaj (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-01-23 | ||||
Joshua Jong Estrada (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-04-01 | ||||
Jakob Kutheus (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-09-11 | ||||
18 | Milian Vidic (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Marzouk Kotya-Fofana (until 2021-12-31) | 2005-02-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-09-11 13:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-18 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-25 13:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-03 11:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-30 11:00 |
8 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-06 11:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-20 11:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-27 13:30 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-12-11 14:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-12 12:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-27 13:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-03-06 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-12 13:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-26 13:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-09 13:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-04-13 19:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-23 15:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |