Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Simon Hohenberg (until 2023-06-30) | 1986-10-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Elias Dreiling (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-06-27 | |||
12 | Xavier Uchmann (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-08-28 | |||
12 | Romero Gerres (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Emre Ertan (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-05 | |||
4 | Bradley Ndi (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-05-02 | |||
14 | Mats Brune (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-28 | |||
16 | Muhammed Karkar (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gökdeniz Senlik (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-05-23 | ||||
Ramu Azemi (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-11-09 | ||||
Zakaria Elhankouri (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-05-17 | ||||
Mert Günes (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-21 | ||||
Leonard Jegus (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-03-06 | ||||
2 | Kevin Stinnen (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-18 | |||
5 | Lennart Bollenberg (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-25 | |||
6 | Mehmet Demirci (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-07-28 | |||
7 | Ahmed Etri (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-05-08 | |||
8 | Berkant Gedikli (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-27 | |||
10 | Milot Ademi (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-10-07 | |||
12 | Noah Koch (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-02-02 | |||
13 | Etienne-Noel Reck (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-05-04 | |||
14 | Glenn Byakoua Youbi (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-08-21 | |||
15 | Edmond Kadrijaj (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-05-30 | |||
16 | Mariano-Valerio Manno (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-03-08 | |||
17 | Giovanni Nkowa (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-09-24 | |||
18 | Alpha Kourouma (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-07 | |||
19 | Nils Chana (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-10-28 | |||
21 | Simon Gawryluk (from 2021-07-21) (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-08-14 | |||
22 | Davud Kocagöz (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-07 | |||
22 | Jaden Kibbe (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
23 | Yan Friessner Montas (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-03-18 | |||
24 | Gianluca Swajkowski (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Luei Mustafa (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-02 | |||
11 | Baran Seker (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-09-11 13:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-09-19 11:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-09-25 13:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-03 11:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-10-10 15:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-10-30 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-06 11:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-12-11 11:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-06 11:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-12 11:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-02-20 14:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-02-26 13:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-05 12:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-12 11:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-02 14:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-09 13:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-04-23 11:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |