Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Onur Cinel (until 2023-06-30) | 1985-06-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Luca Podlech (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-23 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Philip Buczkowski (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-19 | ||||
Armend Likaj (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Vincent Burlet (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Forzan Assan Ouedraogo (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-05-09 | ||||
Alihan Adigüzel (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-09-05 | ||||
Niklas Barthel (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-15 | ||||
Enes Rüzgar (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-10-16 | ||||
Batuhan Yavuz (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-05-04 | ||||
Faaris Yusufu (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-11 | ||||
Niklas Alter (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-03-05 | ||||
Vitalie Becker (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-03 | ||||
Taylan Bulut (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-01-19 | ||||
Niklas Dörr (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-09-18 | ||||
Max Grüger (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-05-24 | ||||
Nedzhib Hadzha (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-08-15 | ||||
Noah Mutanda Kasongo (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-06-21 | ||||
Dorian Nacu (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-06-03 | ||||
Tristan Osmani (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-30 | ||||
Carl Rüger (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-13 | ||||
Lein Tairi (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-08-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2022-04-27 17:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-05-01 13:15 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-05-08 10:45 |
3 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |