Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Carsten Kuhn (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Kritsana Garn Pummarrin (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-09 | |||
1 | Ferdinand Gebert (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-05 | |||
25 | Kevin Malaka (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
25 | Niclas Schmidt (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Lars Strobl (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-15 | |||
3 | Ayyub Baroudi (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-04 | |||
4 | Abba Camara (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Cihan Celik (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-12 | ||||
Joe-Luca Manfred Fuhr (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-06-29 | ||||
4 | Luca Erlein (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
4 | Marcello Maier (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
5 | Georgios Kiriakidis (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-17 | |||
6 | Juan Tiago Esteban Poller (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
7 | Aziz Alagi (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-07 | |||
8 | Paul Hennrich (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-06 | |||
8 | Melvin Onos (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-08-06 | |||
9 | Adijat Sefer (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-20 | |||
9 | Max Moerstedt (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-15 | |||
10 | Leonard Krasniqi (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-09 | |||
11 | Dennis Arnst (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-27 | |||
11 | Baton Hajrizaj (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-31 | |||
12 | Vincenzo Taschetta (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-06-19 | |||
13 | Hennes Behrens (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-19 | |||
13 | Tebo Gabriel (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-02 | |||
14 | Briek Morel (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-23 | |||
15 | Livio Falco (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-30 | |||
16 | Alex Honazjer (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-20 | |||
16 | Felix Binder (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-14 | |||
17 | Louis Wagensommer (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-11 | |||
17 | Demian Bernsee Villiers (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-06-29 | |||
18 | Marlon Freddy Faß (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-16 | |||
19 | Luigi Mignano (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-07 | |||
20 | Iven Kaiser (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-16 | |||
20 | Jamie Jonathan Wähling (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-08-06 | |||
21 | David Girmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-01 | |||
22 | Rafail Savvidis (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-19 | |||
23 | Benjamin Lade (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-06-28 | |||
25 | Luc Ziegler (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-15 | |||
28 | Leandro Mlinaric (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-07 | |||
29 | Blessing Maleko Makanda (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2023-04-02 11:00 |
4 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2023-04-10 13:15 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |