Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Marco Grote (until 2024-06-30) | 1972-10-11 | ||||
Marco Grote (until 2023-06-30) | 1972-10-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Max Köhler (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-29 | ||||
1 | Yannic Stein (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-17 | |||
12 | Berkin Arslanogullari (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jerry Lutzmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-01 | ||||
Leo Sommerfeld (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-27 | ||||
4 | Christopher Ackermann (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-08 | |||
5 | Mathis Bruns (until 2023-01-30) | 2004-03-31 | |||
18 | Fabian Graupner (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-19 | |||
18 | Willi Noack (until 2022-09-30) | 2004-10-08 | |||
19 | Gilles Cedric Kamdem (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Florian Bäker (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-25 | ||||
Nick Graupner (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-28 | ||||
Julian Mätzke (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-18 | ||||
2 | Finn Hoffmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-06 | |||
6 | Aljoscha Kemlein (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-02 | |||
9 | Benjamin Hoffmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-08 | |||
10 | Batuhan Gögce (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-12-15 | |||
14 | Magnus Rösner (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-09 | |||
16 | Julius Grunwald (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-09-11 | |||
18 | Valon Aliji (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-03 | |||
20 | Timon Kramer (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-22 | |||
21 | Albion Jahaj (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-08-05 | |||
22 | Tim Schleinitz (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-10 | |||
23 | Levin Mattmüller (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-01 | |||
24 | Henrik Albert (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-13 | |||
26 | Noah Engelbreth (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-12 | |||
27 | Leonit Ibrahimi (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-14 | |||
28 | Baris Kalayci (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-08-30 | |||
29 | Jerome Scholz (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Malick Sanogo (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-30 | |||
11 | David Preu (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-10-26 | |||
17 | Linus Jurschik (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-10-17 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Mathis Bruns (from 2023-01-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-08-13 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-08-21 14:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-08-28 13:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-09-03 11:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-10-02 11:00 |
0 : 9 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-10-09 10:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-10-30 11:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-11-06 13:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-11-13 13:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-19 13:30 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-12-04 11:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-02-04 13:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2023-02-19 13:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2023-02-26 11:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-04 12:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-03-07 18:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-11 13:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |