Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willi Weisse (until 2024-06-30) | 1988-04-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Erik Herrmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-18 | |||
23 | Johannes Endmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-27 | |||
32 | Maximilan Vollmer (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ali Aezem (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-01 | ||||
Jonathan Akaegbobi (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-25 | ||||
Dustin Arnold (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-10-27 | ||||
Collin Förster (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Fabius-Leander Göpfert (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-19 | ||||
Quentin Grafe (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-09-08 | ||||
Henrik Heße (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-25 | ||||
Adam Hradisky (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-25 | ||||
Sean Kiwus (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Anton Lange (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-25 | ||||
Max Melcher (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-08-11 | ||||
Friedrich Müller (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-14 | ||||
Luan Müller (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-10 | ||||
Oskar Ohnesorge (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-18 | ||||
Pascal Schickor (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-23 | ||||
Mathis Seifert (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-29 | ||||
Cedric Tölg (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-22 | ||||
Owen Warneck (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-07 | ||||
Tobias Zvonek (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-13 | ||||
4 | Nik Orth (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-18 | |||
5 | Kenny Weyh (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-11-01 | |||
6 | Justin Bulang (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-17 | |||
7 | Jonas Saliger (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-13 | |||
8 | Joe Löwe (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-09 | |||
9 | Julius Hoffmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-30 | |||
10 | Jonas Oehmichen (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-03 | |||
11 | Lucas Ehrlich (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-02 | |||
13 | Jules Hasenberg (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-13 | |||
15 | Emil Zeil (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-12-24 | |||
16 | Matthias Wetschka (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-08 | |||
17 | Cornelius Bräunling (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-12-15 | |||
19 | Corvin Kosak (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-12-27 | |||
22 | Moritz Krause (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-26 | |||
23 | Marlon Grafe (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-09-08 | |||
24 | Luca Krause (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-10 | |||
26 | Jakub Spica (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-11-29 | |||
27 | Louis Schulze (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-11-02 | |||
29 | Tony Menzel (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
14 | Paul Lehmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-07-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-08-14 11:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-08-21 12:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-08-27 11:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-09-03 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-10-02 11:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-08 11:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-10-30 11:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-05 14:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-12 12:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-11-19 12:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-12-03 11:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-02-04 13:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-02-11 13:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-02-18 13:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-02-25 12:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-04 |
- : - free day |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-03-11 13:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |